IL HJR0108 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Chicago Public Schools to establish an advisory council when considering changes to guidelines and rules.
Title
CPS-OPEN RULEMAKING PROCESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=108&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0108.htm |