IL HJR0107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, February 14, 2018, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 16, 2018, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 27, 2018, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, February 15, 2018, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 16, 2018, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 20, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 21, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 22, 2018, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 27, 2018, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=107&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0107.htm |