IL HJR0106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the belief that the Illinois Income Tax Act should not be amended to permit taxing retirement income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO TAXES ON RETIREMENT INCOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-19HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback