IL HJR0105 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Route 23 bridge in Streator over the Vermilion River as the "Vietnam Veteran Michael W. Ragusa Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MICHAEL RAGUSA MEMORIAL BRIDGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-28SenateResolution Adopted; 051-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseResolution Adopted 112-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback