IL HJR0104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Interstate 57 from I-74 South to exit 232 as the "Congressman Tim Johnson Highway."
Title
CONGRESSMAN TIM JOHNSON HWY
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-05-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-17 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |