IL HJR0104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of Interstate 57 from I-74 South to exit 232 as the "Congressman Tim Johnson Highway."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRESSMAN TIM JOHNSON HWY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseResolution Adopted 111-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback