IL HJR0102 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulates Jim Kiser on being selected as the City of Darien 2018 Citizen of the Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRATS-JIM KISER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-02-13HouseResolution Adopted
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2018-02-06HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback