IL HJR0101 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Grand Avenue Overpass over Interstate 94 in Gurnee as the "Allen J. Lynch Congressional Medal of Honor Overpass" in honor of Allen Lynch and his accomplishments.
Title
ALLEN J. LYNCH MOH OVERPASS
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-11-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-11-28 | House | Resolution Adopted 108-004-001 |
2012-11-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-11-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-11-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-11-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-11-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |