IL HJR0098 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to commence a procurement process for a project to provide additional highway capacity along Interstate 55 from Interstate 355 to Interstate 90/Interstate 94 in DuPage, Cook, and Will Counties, and toll the additional capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT-INTERSTATE PROJECT AUTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback