IL HJR0098 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to commence a procurement process for a project to provide additional highway capacity along Interstate 55 from Interstate 355 to Interstate 90/Interstate 94 in DuPage, Cook, and Will Counties, and toll the additional capacity.
Title
IDOT-INTERSTATE PROJECT AUTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=98&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0098.htm |