IL HJR0096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 143 as it travels from its intersection with Route 4 east through the City of Marine as the "Larry D. Mills Memorial Highway".
Title
LARRY MILLS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=96&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0096.htm |