IL HJR0095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares October 5, 2018 as "First Illinois General Assembly Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRST ILL. GEN ASSEMBLY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback