IL HJR0095 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Shows support for the Illinois laws reserving the institution of marriage to one man and one woman. States the General Assembly's opposition to any efforts to extend the institution of marriage to 2 individuals of the same sex, whether by statute or by court decision. Urges the members of the General Assembly to adopt HJRCA 50, an amendment to the Illinois Constitution stating that "Only a marriage between a man and a woman shall be valid or recognized in Illinois".
Title
DEFENSE OF MARRIAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2012-08-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2012-08-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-08-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-08-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-07-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-07-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-07-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-07-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-07-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-07-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=95&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0095.htm |