IL HJR0093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Interstate 74 as it travels from mile post 155 to 160 near Farmer City as the "Trooper Ryan Albin Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISP TROOPER ALBIN HIGHWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback