IL HJR0093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Interstate 74 as it travels from mile post 155 to 160 near Farmer City as the "Trooper Ryan Albin Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISP TROOPER ALBIN HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-28SenateResolution Adopted; 051-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-08HouseResolution Adopted 111-000-000
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-04-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback