IL HJR0093 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-13 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-13 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 17 from the Henry/Mercer County Line to the Village of Viola as the CPL Bryant J. Luxmore Memorial Highway.
Title
CPL LUXMORE MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-13 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 049-000-000 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions January 13, 2016 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Resolution Adopted 107-000-000 |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-09-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000 |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-08-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |