IL HJR0093 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that Board of Higher Education, the Illinois Community College Board, and the Illinois Student Assistance Commission shall prepare a report by June 1, 2010 with findings on performance-based funding for higher education and submit that report to the General Assembly.
Title
HIGH ED-PERFORMANCE-BASED FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-03-09 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=93&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0093.htm |