IL HJR0090 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the bridge on Route 160 between Highland and Grantfork in Madison County crossing over I-70 as the "Richard Clayton Bridge-Southern Illinois Bridge Builder".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RICHARD CLAYTON BRIDGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-08HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 111-000-000
2018-05-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-12-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback