IL HJR0084 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted 109-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Veterans Parkway in the Cities of Bloomington and Normal from the intersection of Interstate 74 to intersection of Interstate 55 as the "Army Ranger Sergeant Joshua P. Rodgers Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SGT. RODGERS HIGHWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08HouseResolution Adopted 109-000-000
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000
2017-11-07HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-11-07HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-11-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-11-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback