IL HJR0083 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-5)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges those in government to commit to working to change the culture that breeds sexual harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL HARASSMENT IN GOV.

Sponsors

Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]Rep. Juliana Stratton [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]
Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Al Riley [D]
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Laura Fine [D]
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Carol Sente [D]Rep. Steven Andersson [R]Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]
Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]
Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. Luis Arroyo [D]Rep. Ann Williams [D]
Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Silvana Tabares [D]Rep. Elgie Sims [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D]Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Robert Rita [D]
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Gregory Harris [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]
Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Fred Crespo [D]Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]
Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]
Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Daniel Beiser [D]Rep. John Connor [D]Rep. Louis Lang [D]
Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D]
Rep. Scott Drury [D]Rep. David Olsen [R]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D]
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D]Sen. Heather Steans [D]Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D]Sen. Chris Nybo [R]
Sen. Iris Martinez [D]Sen. Donne Trotter [D]Sen. Julie Morrison [D]Sen. William Cunningham [D]
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D]Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D]Sen. Omar Aquino [D]Sen. Cristina Castro [D]
Sen. Emil Jones [D]Sen. Terry Link [D]Sen. Ira Silverstein [D]Sen. Patricia Vanpelt-Watkins [D]
Sen. Linda Holmes [D]Sen. Melinda Bush [D]Sen. Laura Murphy [D]Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R]

Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-11-07HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-11-07SenateResolution Adopted; 055-000-000
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-07SenateArrive in Senate
2017-11-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-11-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-11-07HouseResolution Adopted 117-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-10-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-10-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback