IL HJR0079 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Big Muddy Bridge east of Waltonville on IL Route 148 as the "Captain Joseph Laur Memorial Bridge".
Title
CPT. J. LAUR MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |