IL HJR0074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Illinois Route 4 as it travels through Chatham as the "U.S. Army Corporal James "Chad" Young Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CPL. JAMES YOUNG MEM. HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 050-000-000
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000
2018-05-22SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-22SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseResolution Adopted 105-000-000
2018-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-06HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback