IL HJR0074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 4 as it travels through Chatham as the "U.S. Army Corporal James "Chad" Young Memorial Highway".
Title
CPL. JAMES YOUNG MEM. HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Resolution Adopted 105-000-000 |
2018-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |