IL HJR0073 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for the Clean Tech Economy Coalition's application to the BBB Regional Challenge and the intent to support the project with funding in the State budget.
Title
CLEAN TECH COALITION-BBB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000 |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2022-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=73&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0073.htm |