IL HJR0070 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates 76th Street in Keithsburg from Jackson Street to IL-17 as the "PO2 Robert Holloway and PO3 Ronald Crose Memorial Highway".
Title
HOLLOWAY & CROSE MEM HIGHWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=70&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0070.htm |