IL HJR0070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the 115th United States Congress to pass House Resolution 38 to create national reciprocity for concealed-carry licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATIONAL CONCEALED CARRY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-07-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-06-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback