IL HJR0070 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SEVENTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, February 23, 2012, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 28, 2012, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Friday, February 24, 2012, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 27, 2012, at 4:00 o'clock p.m., or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-24HouseAdopted Both Houses
2012-02-24SenateResolution Adopted
2012-02-24SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2012-02-24SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. M. Maggie Crotty; 3-6(a)
2012-02-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
2012-02-24SenateArrive in Senate
2012-02-22HouseResolution Adopted
2012-02-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback