IL HJR0069 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Fair and Equitable Assessment of Property Task Force to study issues of assessment equity and fairness, and make recommendations that will ensure accountable and efficient delivery of uniform and transparent property valuations for property tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-08-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-08-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-06-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-06-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-06-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback