IL HJR0068 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs that the question of whether a constitutional convention should be called to be submitted to the electorate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-06-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback