IL HJR0067 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Interstate 55 overpass at Towanda, Exit 171 as the "Officer Patrick Michael Righi Barnard Memorial Overpass".
Title
OFC PATRICK BARNARD MEM EXIT
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-06-29 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2017-06-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-06-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-06-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=67&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0067.htm |