IL HJR0067 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges School District 118 and all other school districts in the State of Illinois to consider adopting the water safety curriculum developed by the students in the Future Problem Solvers Club of North Ridge Middle School and commends the students of the Future Problem Solvers Club for taking the initiative to educate the public on water safety dangers and practices.
Title
WATER SAFETY CURRICULUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions August 4, 2015 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=67&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0067.htm |