IL HJR0066 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Interstate 64 in Wayne County from Mile Post 112 to 116 as the "Deputy Sean Riley Memorial Highway".
Title
DEPUTY SEAN RILEY MEM. HIGHWAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 109-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0066.htm |