IL HJR0066 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Chicago Park District to construct floating marinas in the 31st St. Harbor and the Chicago Gateway Harbor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHICAGO PARK DISTRICT-MARINAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-11 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-11 Adopted Both Houses
2010-03-11 Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
2010-03-11 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney
2010-02-10 Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 16, 2010
2010-02-10 Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
2010-01-13 Re-assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2009-11-30 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2009-10-29 Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2009-05-31 Referred to Assignments
2009-05-31 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2009-05-31 Arrive in Senate
2009-05-31 Resolution Adopted 118-000-000
2009-05-30 Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2009-05-30 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2009-05-30 Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2009-05-30 Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2009-05-30 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
2009-05-30 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2009-05-30 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-30 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback