IL HJR0065 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of road on Illinois Route 2 from North Green Mountain Road to Shiloh Station Road as the "Staff Sergeant Edwin DazaChacon Memorial Road".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STAFF SGT. DAZACHACON HIGHWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback