IL HJR0058 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Savanna-Sabula bridge as the "Dale Gardner Veterans Memorial Bridge".
Title
DALE GARDNER MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=58&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0058.htm |