IL HJR0058 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the Savanna-Sabula bridge as the "Dale Gardner Veterans Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DALE GARDNER MEMORIAL BRIDGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 050-000-000
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2018-05-31SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-26HouseResolution Adopted 114-000-000
2017-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback