IL HJR0057 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates June of 2017 as "Immigrant Heritage Month" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRANT HERITAGE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback