IL HJR0056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes May 19, 2017 as a day to honor police officers and firefighters who have lost their lives and suffer from PTSD, depression, and other mental health issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

1ST RESPONDERS - MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Fire & Emergency Services Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback