IL HJR0053 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes May 10, 2017 as the second Annual Illinois Foster Youth and Alumni Legislative Shadow Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILL FOSTER YOUTH DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-06-23SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback