IL HJR0052 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the State Treasurer to issue official commemorative medallions honoring the State's bicentennial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER - ILL. MEDALLIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-25HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-10-25SenateResolution Adopted; 058-000-000
2017-10-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-10-25SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2017-10-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-18SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-10-18SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted 091-000-000
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback