IL HJR0051 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Burnt Prairie interstate exit at mile marker 117 on Interstate 64 as the "Robert J. "Pud" Williams Memorial Exit".
Title
ROBERT WILLIAMS MEMORIAL EXIT
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 049-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |