IL HJR0048 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Girls Adolescent Domestic Battery Task Force to address the problem of the detention of adolescent girls for domestic battery across the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GIRLS-DOMESTIC BATTERY TSK FCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-09-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback