IL HJR0047 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Coal Ash Task Force to bring legislators, coal company representatives, environmental experts, and the public to together to study the effects of coal ash on the Vermilion River and the rest of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL ASH TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000
2019-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-26HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-03-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback