IL HJR0045 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares September 1, 2021 as Trans World Airlines Flight 529 Memorial Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
TWA FLIGHT 529 MEMORIAL DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=45&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0045.htm |