IL HJR0045 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Declares that the State shall appropriate for no more than an X% increase for wage increases associated with any and all collectively bargained contracts throughout State government. States the policy of the State of Illinois that the size of, or a reduction in, the State employee workforce shall not be a topic of collective bargaining.
Title
UNION CONTRACT INCREASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-11-28 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 084-029-000 |
2012-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-11-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-11-09 | House | Re-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-01-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-01-12 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-11-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-11-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-11-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2011-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-10-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-10-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-10-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |