IL HJR0042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the portion of Illinois Route 97 in Springfield from 9th Street to Veterans Parkway as "Honorary Andre Iguodala Drive".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HONORARY ANDRE IGUODALA DRIVE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 053-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
2017-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-19SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-11SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted 112-000-000
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-04-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback