IL HJR0042 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of road on Route 120/Belvidere Road between John Mogg and Sears Boulevard in Grayslake as the "Army SPC Joseph "Joey" W. Dimock II Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ARMY SPC DIMOCK MEMORIAL HWY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseAdopted Both Houses
2015-07-01SenateResolution Adopted; 046-000-000
2015-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015
2015-05-13SenateBe Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
2015-05-06SenateAssigned to Transportation
2015-04-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2015-04-29SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-28HouseResolution Adopted 114-000-000
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2015-04-21HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000
2015-03-23HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2015-02-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback