IL HJR0042 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges school districts to improve support resources for involvement of parents in their education of their children.
Title
SCHOOLS-SUPPORT SRVC-PARENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Held in Education |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2011-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 |
2011-10-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-10-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-09-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |