IL HJR0037 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Interstate I-155 from Interstate 74 to IL Route 9 near Morton and Tremont as the "CWO4 John W. Frederick Jr. Memorial Highway."
Title
JOHN W. FREDERICK JR. HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-21 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |