IL HJR0037 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the International Job Protection Task Force within the Illinois Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity - Office of Trade and Investment to (1) analyze important issues relative to the growth of international trade from and to Illinois; (2) make recommendations to Congress, the United States Trade Representative, and the White House National Trade Council regarding trade policies that best serve Illinois; and (3) promote the protection of Illinois jobs relative to international trade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRADE POLICY TSK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 049-001-000
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateBe Adopted State Government; 005-003-000
2017-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-22SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000
2017-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 International Trade & Commerce Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-28HouseAssigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback